Fast Multiplication Trick 5 - Trick to Directly Multiply the Big Numbers.wmv

Share
Embed
  • Published on Aug 19, 2012
  • For more videos visit
    usclip.net/p/PLslHpAcLS1CQbU41jY0VYV3P77hSm-02N
    usclip.net/p/PLslHpAcLS1CRRwkEuSkM8ud1bR86FynGk

Comments • 2 739

  • steven fletcher
    steven fletcher 12 hours ago

    WOW.

  • Thomas Kelly
    Thomas Kelly Day ago +1

    What would be the method for 2 numbers with a different number of digits? like 3214x345

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  13 hours ago

      same method, watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • HOLLINS TWESIGYE
    HOLLINS TWESIGYE Day ago +1

    tnx very very much sir

  • Suryanshu Kumar
    Suryanshu Kumar Day ago

    Bsdk kitna bakwas krta h direct point pe ny aata h koi v youtuber bakchodi krna jroori h

  • Rail Zone
    Rail Zone Day ago

    Sir app kha say ho India say ho to hindi bola krea ajj Mai please nehi lagau ga

  • 🔋BATTERY🔋
    🔋BATTERY🔋 Day ago

    वैदिक गणित

  • Matpush Algagum
    Matpush Algagum 2 days ago

    Working cold 🥶 would heat a pattern and lessen your stress

  • Mr Bitty
    Mr Bitty 3 days ago +1

    Thanks you I will come again

  • Danny Lamsen
    Danny Lamsen 3 days ago

    stop it.......

  • Danny Lamsen
    Danny Lamsen 3 days ago

    only your self to understant what your teach dam youy

  • Matthias G.
    Matthias G. 3 days ago +1

    Thanks for this Great Form of multiplikation

  • Mathematics Learning

    Its really amazing sir thanks

  • harikumar c
    harikumar c 6 days ago +2

    Thanks for this video now I studied to calculating multiplication become easy and fast,😎👍

  • Pogba Fahmy
    Pogba Fahmy 6 days ago +1

    This is brilliant!!

  • azahakuddin ahamed
    azahakuddin ahamed 6 days ago

    Very bad USclipr... Come to the point ... Make your video as short as possible... India me 2 min ka Maggi he famous hai... But good content ... Long mutltipication Wala dekhana ka ke matlab

  • Kenneth Negaard
    Kenneth Negaard 7 days ago +1

    Very good explanation. Thank you.

  • Cognitive Dissonance
    Cognitive Dissonance 7 days ago +1

    Suddenly I became a believer in Vedic Math.

  • Josephine Alquinto
    Josephine Alquinto 8 days ago +1

    Is that method true to all big numbers?

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  7 days ago

      watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • Amrik Mahal
    Amrik Mahal 9 days ago +4

    Slow down a bit. Not every one can get it at the speed you are explaining.

  • Ad Ekka
    Ad Ekka 9 days ago

    Wow amazing

  • ganesh sekar
    ganesh sekar 10 days ago

    Is it possible for any digit multiplication??

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  7 days ago

      watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • mohamed hassan
    mohamed hassan 11 days ago +2

    You totally smart and you teched a lot today

  • Melinda Eshenour
    Melinda Eshenour 11 days ago +1

    mind blown

  • A B
    A B 12 days ago

    I've determined that all of my math teachers sucked, basically taught to fail the hard way.

  • Tony Barfridge
    Tony Barfridge 12 days ago +1

    This is great to know, only it doesn't work for parts which total over 99

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  12 days ago

      It works, carry the 3rd digit one more place to the left

  • mohamed malik
    mohamed malik 13 days ago

    U dont have proper teaching skill.u only understant what u say.tell slowly are else dont do that

  • v kumar
    v kumar 13 days ago

    For larger numbers i don't see how this is more economical over the straightforward well known long multiply method

    • A B
      A B 12 days ago

      Still easier r tard

  • Jedi
    Jedi 13 days ago +1

    Thank you Ma brother for helping me

  • Perfect Cards
    Perfect Cards 13 days ago +2

    Thanks so much this made math a lot easier have a good day

  • prasanna kumar sonu
    prasanna kumar sonu 14 days ago +1

    Can u do this kind of methods on 4num's with 3num's like Eg: 543*3124...

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  13 days ago +1

      watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • Casimira Altomare
    Casimira Altomare 14 days ago

    yay!

  • vishal wakchaure
    vishal wakchaure 15 days ago

    it is such an easy method

  • Suman Ray Pramanik
    Suman Ray Pramanik 15 days ago

    how do we add a number greater than 100, which we get
    after cross multiplication, or a combination of cross and vertical multiplication

  • A P
    A P 15 days ago +1

    Thanks a lot for sharing such a great trick. Thanks to our Vedas too.

  • OFFICIAL Reload
    OFFICIAL Reload 16 days ago

    Only problem is we cant do it in the head

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  14 days ago

      watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • Arjun Verma
    Arjun Verma 16 days ago

    can we apply this trick if the numbers we have to multiply have different number of digits ie 25478(5 digit number) and 3365(4 digit number).

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  14 days ago

      yes, watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • Jason Butler
    Jason Butler 16 days ago +2

    Some would say this takes as much time as the basic method. With some practice you can solve some pretty big numbers in your head at lightning speed with this method. Very nice video.

  • Do Doo
    Do Doo 16 days ago

    Its way too easier the usual way lol. This method takes way too much time and i have do this cross multiplication and the add them and then do it from other side too... Fuck you

  • jarman
    jarman 17 days ago

    جميل

  • mogens nielsen
    mogens nielsen 18 days ago

    how do you multiply odd numbers?

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  17 days ago

      watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • Dastagiri Sk
    Dastagiri Sk 18 days ago

    Not intrsting to second methad

  • ZeReF
    ZeReF 18 days ago

    But for this number (6106 x 6106) why this method doesn’t work???

    • Zakk Marks
      Zakk Marks 18 days ago +1

      It does work, you may have gotten confused with the 0's.

  • R D
    R D 19 days ago

    This guy is fucking annoying. I could have traveled to India and learned this whole lesson in less time than it took him to pause

  • Miserable Eggman
    Miserable Eggman 20 days ago

    CAN YOU SOLVE THIS QUESTION?
    I was playing a video game & the enemy I was facing did devastating attacks. My avatar blocked 70.00% of the damage, this resulted in my avatar only taking 20,018,843 damage. If my avatar failed to block the attack, how much damage would he actually take?

    • Arjun Verma
      Arjun Verma 16 days ago

      30/100 * x = 20018843
      thus x = (20018843*100)/30 is the total damage that was enforced

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  19 days ago +1

      sorry i can't understand your last line i.e "how much damage would he actually take?"
      but solution may be-
      70% = 20,018,843
      so, 100%= 10 * (20,018,843 / 7)

  • Lil Rice
    Lil Rice 20 days ago

    Can you do it from right to left. ? Does the answer come out the same .

    • Lil Rice
      Lil Rice 17 days ago

      S H lmao istg my dads using my yt acc lmao

    • S H
      S H 18 days ago

      Lil Rice //
      He DID it from RIGHT to LEFT! Already..

  • Naranath Neupane
    Naranath Neupane 20 days ago +2

    Please so the idea of doing from 3 numbers to many numbers

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  19 days ago

      watch these videos-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • Flasker1001
    Flasker1001 20 days ago

    NOT STANDARD!!!. Only work fast with small digits and small numbers. Try 898659 X 987659 => easily get incorrect answer.

  • Craig Adams
    Craig Adams 21 day ago

    Good to learn alternate method, and very useful. However so is my calculator, and so I'll use that

  • Bayram Yorulmaz
    Bayram Yorulmaz 21 day ago

    👍

  • Li Su
    Li Su 21 day ago +2

    That's very impressive, but need sometime to practice, or starting in this method when you first learned. Anyway, it's awesome!!

  • Sharmila M D
    Sharmila M D 21 day ago

    8243×7214?

  • Vegan Malnourishment
    Vegan Malnourishment 21 day ago +1

    Super dope I feel smart

  • Para Sa Tabi
    Para Sa Tabi 21 day ago +3

    It takes practice to do this fast. Thanks for the tip.

  • Rajesh Sachdeva
    Rajesh Sachdeva 21 day ago

    Tell the method for 1st class

  • CA Ashish Barthwal
    CA Ashish Barthwal 22 days ago +6

    The second methods takes approximately same time comparing to old

  • Roman Namor
    Roman Namor 23 days ago

    I prefer first version. I took random higher numbers and lost in adding them like in your method. Result was an incorrect answer. 😂

  • Ashraf Mc
    Ashraf Mc 24 days ago

    what's the answer 3478x 2749 explain

  • ZUHAYER
    ZUHAYER 25 days ago

    Amar matha

  • Denis Martin
    Denis Martin 26 days ago +1

    This wont work with everybody

    • Marans Candy
      Marans Candy 25 days ago

      You mean the “hold in your mind” part for very large numbers?

    • Pradeep Kumar
      Pradeep Kumar  25 days ago

      Thanks for your comment but, watch these videos too-
      usclip.net/video/fPI-nqI7Fc0/video.html
      usclip.net/video/zjkiCovHIdg/video.html

  • norman roeder
    norman roeder 27 days ago

    You need to speak better english to be understood.